NC S253 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-537
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-28 - Ch. SL 2009-537
Summary
Absentee Voting Improvements.
Title
Absentee Voting Improvements.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Steve Goss [D] | Sen. Martin Nesbitt [D] | Sen. John Snow [D] |
Sen. Albin Swindell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-28 | Ch. SL 2009-537 | |
2009-08-28 | Signed By Gov. 8/28/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Pres. To Gov. 8/6/2009 | |
2009-08-06 | Ratified | |
2009-08-05 | Concurred In H/com Sub | |
2009-08-04 | Placed On Cal For 8/5/2009 | |
2009-08-04 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-03 | Placed On Cal For 8/4/2009 | |
2009-07-30 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2009-07-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-29 | Placed On Cal For 7/30/2009 | |
2009-07-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-29 | Serial referral to State Government/State Personnel is stricken. | |
2009-07-29 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-11 | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-23 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-02-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H378 (Same As) 2011-06-10 - Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Transportation
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=S253 |