NC S249 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Zoning/Recreational Land Req.-Morrisville
Title
Zoning/Recreational Land Req.-Morrisville
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Re-ref Com On Elections |
2016-07-01 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-09-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-09-28 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-09-28 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary I Stricken |
2015-04-22 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Judiciary I |
2015-04-22 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary II |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H322 (Same As) 2015-06-30 - Ch. SL 2015-130