NC S239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-27 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-27 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Children of Wartime Vets/Scholarships
Title
Children of Wartime Vets/Scholarships
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. Valerie Jean Foushee [D] |
Sen. Jim Perry [R] | Sen. Gladys Robinson [D] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2019-09-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-13 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-02 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-02 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-01 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Filed |