NC S233 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Re-ref Com On Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Modify Fox/Coyote Taking for Certain Counties

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modify Fox/Coyote Taking for Certain Counties

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-07HouseRe-ref Com On Local Government
2021-10-07HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-08HouseRe-ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-08HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-04-21HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-04-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-04-20HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-04-20SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-04-15SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-04-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-04-14SenateReptd Fav
2021-03-31SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-31SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-03-31SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-11SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-10SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
113291.4B(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback