NC S231 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agency Policy Directives/2019-2021
Title
Agency Policy Directives/2019-2021
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. Jim Perry [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] |
Sen. Paul Lowe [D] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2020-06-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2020-06-25 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2020-06-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-24 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2020-06-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2020-06-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-13 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-03 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-02 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Filed |