NC S224 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

San. Dist. Amendment/Property Transfer

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San. Dist. Amendment/Property Transfer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2022-06-06SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2022-06-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2022-06-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2022-06-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2022-06-02HouseAdded to Calendar
2022-06-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2022-06-02HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2022-06-01HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2022-06-01HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-07-02HouseRe-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-07-02HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-31HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-31HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-30HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-03-30SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-03-25SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-24SenateReptd Fav
2021-03-23SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-23SenateReptd Fav
2021-03-11SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-10SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
130A55(n/a)Citation Text
14674(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback