NC S221 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Local Govt. Bd of Adjust. Virtual Mtgs
Title
Local Govt. Bd of Adjust. Virtual Mtgs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Counties
Durham County
Forsyth County
Fuquay-varina
Holly Springs
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Orange County
Planning & Zoning
Property
Public Meetings
Telecommunications
Teleconferencing
Teleservices
Title Change
Wake County
Winston-salem
Durham County
Forsyth County
Fuquay-varina
Holly Springs
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Orange County
Planning & Zoning
Property
Public Meetings
Telecommunications
Teleconferencing
Teleservices
Title Change
Wake County
Winston-salem
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
166A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
166A | 19.24 | (n/a) | Citation Text |