NC S216 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Local Firefighter Relief Fund Reporting
Title
Local Firefighter Relief Fund Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations on Pensions, Compensation, and Benefits. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |