NC S212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Ch. SL 2020-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Capital Appropriations/R&R/DIT/Cybersecurity

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital Appropriations/R&R/DIT/Cybersecurity

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-07-15 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 2 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-07-11 - House - A1 Dobson Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01 Ch. SL 2020-81
2020-07-01 Signed by Gov. 7/1/2020
2020-06-26 Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020
2020-06-26 Ratified
2020-06-26SenateOrdered Enrolled
2020-06-26SenateConf Report Adopted
2020-06-26SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2020-06-26HouseConf Report Adopted
2020-06-26HouseAdded to Calendar
2020-06-26HouseConf Com Reported
2020-06-26SenateConf Com Reported
2020-06-25SenateConferees Changed
2020-06-25SenateConferees Reappointed
2020-06-25SenateConf Com Dismissed
2020-06-23HouseConferees Reappointed
2020-06-23HouseConf Com Dismissed
2019-07-15HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-07-15SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-07-15SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2019-07-11SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2019-07-11HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-07-11HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-07-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-11HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-11HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-07-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-10HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-09HousePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-07-08HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-06-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-07HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-02SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-20SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-20SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-03-20SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-14SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H320 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/S212
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S212v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S212v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S212v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S212v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S212v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S212v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S212v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S212v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/Senate/PDF/S212v8.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/136
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/664
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/663
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/483
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/1066
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/880

Bill Comments

feedback