NC S199 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Ch. SL 2019-245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Ch. SL 2019-245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Child Sex Abuse/Strengthen Laws
Title
Child Sex Abuse/Strengthen Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-08-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-07-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-07-30 - House - A1 Riddell Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-07-30 - House - A2 Insko Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-07-30 - House - A3 Morey Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-07-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-10-31 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-08-06 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-07-31 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-07-30 - House - A1 Riddell Second Reading (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-07-30 - House - A2 Insko Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 74 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-07-30 - House - A3 Morey Second Reading (Y: 52 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-07-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | Ch. SL 2019-245 | |
2019-11-07 | Signed by Gov. 11/7/2019 | |
2019-11-01 | Pres. To Gov. 11/1/2019 | |
2019-10-31 | Ratified | |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-31 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/31/2019 |
2019-10-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-10-30 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 10/31/2019 |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-09-13 | House | Conferees Changed |
2019-08-21 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2019-08-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-08-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-31 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2019-07-31 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-30 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2019-07-30 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2019-07-30 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-07-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/30/2019 |
2019-07-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-07-22 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-22 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-27 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-06 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reconsidered 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H596 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House