NC S197 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Ch. SL 2021-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Ch. SL 2021-85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
GSC Trusts & Estates Amendments
Title
GSC Trusts & Estates Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Ch. SL 2021-85 | |
2021-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2021 | |
2021-07-06 | Pres. To Gov. 7/6/2021 | |
2021-07-02 | Ratified | |
2021-06-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-30 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-30 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary 1, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-14 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-08 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-05 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
28A | 2A-9 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
31 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
31 | 3.4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
36C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
36C | 1-103 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
36C | 1-105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
36C | 8A-1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
36C | 8A-12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
36C | 8A-2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
36C | 8A-3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
36C | 8A-4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
36C | 8A-4.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
36C | 8A-4.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
36C | 8A-8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
41 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
41 | 15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
41 | 18 | (n/a) | Citation Text |