NC S194 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Ch. SL 2019-160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Ch. SL 2019-160
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
West Jefferson/Saluda Satellite Annexations
Title
West Jefferson/Saluda Satellite Annexations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-23 - Senate - Conference Rpt For Adoption Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Conference Rpt For Adoption Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-15 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-07-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-23 - House - R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - Senate - Conference Rpt For Adoption Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-07-22 - House - R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-07-15 - Senate - For Concurrence Second Reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-07-10 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Ch. SL 2019-160 | |
2019-07-24 | Ratified | |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2019-07-23 | House | Conf Report Adopted 3rd |
2019-07-22 | House | Conf Report Adopted 2nd |
2019-07-22 | Senate | Conf Report Passed 2nd |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Held As Material |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2019-07-17 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/22/2019 |
2019-07-17 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d) |
2019-07-17 | House | Ruled Material |
2019-07-17 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2019-07-16 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Failed Concur In H Com Sub |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-07-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019 |
2019-07-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-26 | House | Ruled Material |
2019-06-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-06-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-21 | House | Re-ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-25 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-22 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Filed |