NC S192 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Ch. SL 2021-41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Ch. SL 2021-41
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
City of Hickory/Planning Commission
Title
City of Hickory/Planning Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Ch. SL 2021-41 | |
2021-06-16 | Ratified | |
2021-06-15 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-02 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-24 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
Subjects
Catawba County
Chaptered
Commissions
Counties
Hickory
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Property
Ratified
Session Laws
Chaptered
Commissions
Counties
Hickory
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Planning & Zoning
Property
Ratified
Session Laws