NC S191 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on October 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-15 - Ch. SL 2021-171
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

The No Patient Left Alone Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The No Patient Left Alone Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-06 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-23 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-08-24 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-08-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 88 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-15 Ch. SL 2021-171
2021-10-15 Signed by Gov. 10/15/2021
2021-10-08 Pres. To Gov. 10/8/2021
2021-10-07 Ratified
2021-10-06SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-10-06SenateConf Report Adopted
2021-10-05SenatePlaced On Cal For 10/06/2021
2021-10-05SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-09-27SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-09-27SenateConf Com Reported
2021-09-23HouseConf Report Adopted
2021-09-23HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-09-23HouseConf Com Reported
2021-08-31HouseConf Com Appointed
2021-08-30SenateConf Com Appointed
2021-08-24SenateFail Concur In H Amend S191v3
2021-08-23SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/24/2021
2021-08-23SenateRegular Message Received For Concurrence in H Amend
2021-08-19HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2021-08-18HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-08-18HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-08-18HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-08-18HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-08-18HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-08-18HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-08-18HouseReptd Fav
2021-08-04HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-08-04HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-05-10HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-10HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-06HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-05-06SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-05-05SenateEngrossed
2021-05-05SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-05-05SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-05-05SenateAmend Adopted A1
2021-05-04SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/05/2021
2021-05-04SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2021-04-29SenatePlaced On Cal For 05/04/2021
2021-04-29SenateReptd Fav
2021-04-28SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-04-28SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2021-04-28SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-03-25SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-25SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-09SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-09SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-08SenateFiled

Subjects


Code Citations


North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S191
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S191v5.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/50784/0/S191-PCS45408-BC-17
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/51369/0/S191-A-NBC-8938
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52736/0/S191-ASH-51-V-1
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/53121/0/S191-PCCS35331-BC-5
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S191-SMBC-38(CSBC-17)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S191-SMBC-57(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S191-SMBC-148(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S191-SMBC-158(CCSBC-5)-v-1
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/141
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/142
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/471
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/406
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/529
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/478

Bill Comments

feedback