NC S189 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
CTE Pilot for Guilford Co. Schools
Title
CTE Pilot for Guilford Co. Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] | Sen. Richard Gunn [R] | Sen. Gladys Robinson [D] | Sen. Valerie Jean Foushee [D] |
Sen. Michael Garrett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H275 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Re-ref Com On Finance