NC S188 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Ch. SL 2021-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Ch. SL 2021-81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Bd. of Architects/Interior Designers
Title
Bd. of Architects/Interior Designers
Sponsors
Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Amy Galey [R] | Sen. Lisa Barnes [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Ch. SL 2021-81 | |
2021-07-08 | Signed by Gov. 7/8/2021 | |
2021-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2021 | |
2021-06-30 | Ratified | |
2021-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-29 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-10 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-10 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-06-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-29 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H223 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Appointments
Architects & Architecture
Architecture Board
Boards
Chaptered
Council Of State
Fees
Governor
Interior Design
Licensing & Certification
Membership
Name Change
Occupations
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Architects & Architecture
Architecture Board
Boards
Chaptered
Council Of State
Fees
Governor
Interior Design
Licensing & Certification
Membership
Name Change
Occupations
Presented
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83A | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
83A | 1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 10 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 11 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 12 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 13 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 15 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 16 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 6 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 7 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
83A | 9 | (n/a) | Citation Text |