NC S185 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Ch. SL 2017-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Ch. SL 2017-14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Abolish Columbus/Cleveland County Coroner
Title
Abolish Columbus/Cleveland County Coroner
Sponsors
Sen. Danny Britt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Ch. SL 2017-14 | |
2017-05-22 | Ratified | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 05/18/2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2017-05-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-05-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/11/2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-05-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-05-08 | House | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government I |
2017-05-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-24 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-24 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-21 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H290 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate