NC S182 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-05 - Ch. SL 2015-190
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Automatic License Plate Readers
Title
Automatic License Plate Readers
Sponsors
Sen. Floyd McKissick [D] | Sen. John Barefoot [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] | Sen. Paul Lowe [D] |
Sen. Joyce Waddell [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - A2 Hager Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - A1 Blackwell Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - A2 Hager Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - A1 Blackwell Second Reading (Y: 104 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-05 | Ch. SL 2015-190 | |
2015-08-05 | Signed by Gov. 8/5/2015 | |
2015-07-31 | Pres. To Gov. 07/31/2015 | |
2015-07-30 | Ratified | |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-29 | Senate | Concurred In H/Com Sub |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/29/2015 |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/27/2015 |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/23/2015 |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2015-07-22 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-07-21 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2015-07-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-21 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2015-07-21 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2015-07-20 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/21/2015 |
2015-07-20 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-07-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-07-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-07-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-07-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-06-30 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary IV, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-06-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-30 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary IV, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-29 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/29/2015 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Filed |