NC S161 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Enact the North Carolina Caregivers Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact the North Carolina Caregivers Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17HouseRe-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-06-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-09HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-09HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-08HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2019-05-08SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-05-07SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06SenateReptd Fav
2019-05-02SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-05-02SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-07SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-07SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-02-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H269 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback