NC S160 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Pensions & Retirement & Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Pensions & Retirement & Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Enhance SHP Debt Collection Abilities.-AB
Title
Enhance SHP Debt Collection Abilities.-AB
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H176 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Health
Insurance
Public
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Health Plan
State Health Plan Board
Teachers
Insurance
Public
Salaries & Benefits
State Employees
State Health Plan
State Health Plan Board
Teachers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
135 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
135 | 48.37B | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
135 | 48.37C | (n/a) | Citation Text |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S160 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S160v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S160v1.pdf |