NC S151 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Ch. SL 2019-40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Ch. SL 2019-40
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Break or Enter Pharmacy/Increase Penalty
Title
Break or Enter Pharmacy/Increase Penalty
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas McInnis [R] | Sen. Danny Britt [R] | Sen. James Davis [R] | Sen. Todd Johnson [R] |
Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 41 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Ch. SL 2019-40 | |
2019-06-21 | Signed by Gov. 6/21/2019 | |
2019-06-14 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2019 | |
2019-06-13 | Ratified | |
2019-06-12 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-06-12 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-12 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/12/2019 |
2019-06-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-23 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-03-20 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-20 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-20 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H212 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House