NC S145 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Ch. SL 2021-44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Ch. SL 2021-44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Winston-Salem/Real Property Conveyances
Title
Winston-Salem/Real Property Conveyances
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Lowe [D] | Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-17 | Ch. SL 2021-44 | |
2021-06-17 | Ratified | |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-15 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-12 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H250 (Same As) 2021-04-22 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Chaptered
Counties
Forsyth County
Housing
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Poverty
Property
Ratified
Real Estate
Sales & Conveyances
Winston-salem
Counties
Forsyth County
Housing
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
Poverty
Property
Ratified
Real Estate
Sales & Conveyances
Winston-salem