NC S1438 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-14 - Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Alcoholic Beverage Control
Pending: House Local Government II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-14 - Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Alcoholic Beverage Control
Pending: House Local Government II Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
New Hanover ABC Board Membership
Title
New Hanover ABC Board Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-14 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Alcoholic Beverage Control | |
2010-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-27 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1977 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Alcoholic Beverage Control