NC S140 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Ch. SL 2018-38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Ch. SL 2018-38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Title Ins. Rev/Bailbondsmen Deposits
Title
Title Ins. Rev/Bailbondsmen Deposits
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Hise [R] | Sen. Ronald Rabin [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Ch. SL 2018-38 | |
2018-06-22 | Signed by Gov. 6/22/2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018 | |
2018-06-14 | Ratified | |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-13 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-12 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/13/2018 |
2018-06-12 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-12 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-06 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2018-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-06 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government II, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-05 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 04/04/2017 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Filed |