NC S126 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Ch. SL 2021-90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clean Up Obsolete Boards

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clean Up Obsolete Boards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-14 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 84 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 77 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-22 Ch. SL 2021-90
2021-07-22 Signed by Gov. 7/22/2021
2021-07-15 Pres. To Gov. 7/15/2021
2021-07-15 Ratified
2021-07-15SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-07-14HouseConf Report Adopted
2021-07-14HouseAdded to Calendar
2021-07-14HouseConf Com Reported
2021-07-14SenateConf Report Adopted
2021-07-14SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2021-07-14SenateConf Com Reported
2021-07-13HouseConf Com Appointed
2021-07-13SenateConf Com Appointed
2021-06-29SenateFailed Concur In H Com Sub
2021-06-25SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/29/2021
2021-06-25SenateSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
2021-06-24HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-06-24HouseOrdered Engrossed
2021-06-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-06-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-06-24HouseAmend Adopted A1
2021-06-23HousePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2021
2021-06-23HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2021-06-23HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2021-06-16HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-16HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2021-06-07HouseRe-ref to the Com on State Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-07HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-03-17HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-03-17HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-03-16HouseRegular Message Received From Senate
2021-03-16SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2021-03-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-03-11SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-03-10SenateReptd Fav
2021-03-09SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-03-09SenateReptd Fav
2021-02-24SenateRe-ref to Agriculture, Energy, and Environment. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2021-02-24SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2021-02-24SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled

Subjects

Agriculture
Airports
Appointments
Authorities
Aviation
Blount Street Oversight Comm.
Boards
Cash Crops
Chaptered
Charlotte
Chief Information Officer
Colleges & Universities
Commerce
Commissions
Committees
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Board
Community Development
Controlled Substances
Counties
Criminal Justice Information Bd.
Education
Employment
Foster Care
General Assembly
General Statutes
Global Transpark Authority
Governmental Operations Comn.
Health Services
Higher Education
Historic Preservation
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Licensing & Certification
Massage Therapy
Massage Therapy Board
Mecklenburg County
Membership
Methamphetamine Comn.
Minors
Motor Vehicle Dealers Board
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Ncworks Comn.
Obsolete Laws
Occupations
Permanency Initiative Oversight Comm.
Pharmaceuticals
Presented
Property
Public
Public Officials
Public Telecommunications Agency
Raleigh
Ratified
Real Estate
Sales & Conveyances
School Of Science & Math
School Of Science & Math Board
School Technology Comn.
Science & Technology Board
Secondary Education
Social Services
Special Economic Zones
Stem
Studies
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications
Tobacco
Transportation
Unc
Vacancies
Wake County

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105278.1(n/a)Citation Text
106(n/a)Citation Text
106145.11(n/a)Citation Text
115C(n/a)Citation Text
115C102.5(n/a)Citation Text
115C102.6(n/a)Citation Text
115D2.1(n/a)Citation Text
115D2.2(n/a)Citation Text
116233(n/a)Citation Text
120123(n/a)Citation Text
12074(n/a)Citation Text
12075(n/a)Citation Text
131D10.9A(n/a)Citation Text
138A(n/a)Citation Text
138A24(n/a)Citation Text
138A3(n/a)Citation Text
143(n/a)Citation Text
143345.21(n/a)Citation Text
143345.23(n/a)Citation Text
143345.24(n/a)Citation Text
143345.25(n/a)Citation Text
143490(n/a)Citation Text
143506(n/a)Citation Text
143B(n/a)Citation Text
143B432(n/a)Citation Text
143B433(n/a)Citation Text
143B438.10(n/a)Citation Text
143B472.81(n/a)Citation Text
143B925(n/a)Citation Text
20(n/a)Citation Text
20305.4(n/a)Citation Text
20305.5(n/a)Citation Text
63A3(n/a)Citation Text
90(n/a)Citation Text
90113.64(n/a)Citation Text
90625(n/a)Citation Text
96(n/a)Citation Text
964(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S126
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S126v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S126v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S126v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S126v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S126v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S126v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S126v6.pdf
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52151/0/S126-PCS45436-RN-18
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52270/0/S126-PCS35305-RN-26
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52317/0/S126-A-NBC-9041
Amendmenthttps://webservices.ncleg.gov/ViewBillDocument/2021/52493/0/S126-PCCS45449-RN-1
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S126-SMBK-2(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S126-SMTQ-9(e1)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S126-SMRN-67(CSRN-18)-v-8
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S126-SMRN-74(e2)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S126-SMRN-75(e3)-v-2
Supplementhttps://dashboard.ncleg.gov/api/Services/BillSummary/2021/S126-SMRN-78(e4)-v-2
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/45
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/418
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/326
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/S/346
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2021/H/436

Bill Comments 750

feedback