NC S123 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Geo Iso Sch/Transp Eff Buff/Currituck Cty Sch
Title
Geo Iso Sch/Transp Eff Buff/Currituck Cty Sch
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2019-08-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 08/07/2019 |
2019-08-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub |
2019-07-24 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/23/2019 |
2019-07-22 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-22 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-16 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-21 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-21 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-06 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-06-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-05-09 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-08 | House | Special Message Received From Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Education/Higher Education |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |