NC S121 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Appropriations/Base Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Community College System Salary Increases
Title
Community College System Salary Increases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H126 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgeting
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Office
Employment
Higher Education
Personnel
Public
Salaries & Benefits
Budgeting
Colleges & Universities
Community Colleges
Community Colleges Office
Employment
Higher Education
Personnel
Public
Salaries & Benefits
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2021/S121 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S121v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2021/Bills/Senate/PDF/S121v1.pdf |