NC S1209 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Public Utilities
Pending: House Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Public Utilities
Pending: House Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study Competing Systems/Interim Debt
Title
Study Competing Systems/Interim Debt
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Blue [D] | Sen. Peter Brunstetter [R] | Sen. Fletcher Hartsell [R] | Sen. David Hoyle [D] |
Sen. Clark Jenkins [D] | Sen. Jerry Tillman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Public Utilities | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-07 | Engrossed | |
2010-06-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-07 | Amendment Withdrawn # 4 | |
2010-06-07 | Amend Adopted # 3 | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-06-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-19 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |