NC S1202 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Ch. SL 2010-123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Budget Technical Corrections
Title
Budget Technical Corrections
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Atwater [D] | Sen. Harry Brown [R] | Sen. Donald Davis [D] | Sen. Tony Foriest [D] |
Sen. Steve Goss [D] | Sen. Fletcher Hartsell [R] | Sen. William Purcell [D] | Sen. John Snow [D] |
Sen. Albin Swindell [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-10 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-10 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-10 - Senate - Motion 8\To Concur (Y: 11 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Ch. SL 2010-123 | |
2010-07-21 | Signed By Gov. 7/21/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Ratified | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-10 | Placed On Cal For 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-07-10 | Concurred In H Amend # 2 | |
2010-07-10 | Concurred In H Amend # 1 | |
2010-07-10 | Failed Concur In Com Sub | |
2010-07-10 | Placed On Cal For 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Rec To Concur H Com Sub | |
2010-07-10 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-09 | Last Action Reconsidered | |
2010-07-09 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-09 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2010-07-09 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2010-07-09 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-07-09 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-07-07 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-07-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-07-07 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-07-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-07-06 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-07-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-30 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-30 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-17 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-18 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-05-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1700 (Same As) 2010-05-25 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations