NC S114 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Ch. SL 2021-5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Ch. SL 2021-5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
DES COVID Modifications and Technical Changes
Title
DES COVID Modifications and Technical Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Motion 9 To Concur (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Ch. SL 2021-5 | |
2021-03-30 | Signed by Gov. 3/30/2021 | |
2021-03-30 | Pres. To Gov. 3/30/2021 | |
2021-03-30 | Ratified | |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Concurred In H Com Sub |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-03-30 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-03-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/30/2021 |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2021-03-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-03-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-03-15 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-03-15 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-03-11 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H107 (Same As) 2021-03-10 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Subjects
Chaptered
Commerce
Corporate Income
Corporations
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
For-profit
Insurance
Nonprofit
Presented
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Ratified
Tax Credits
Taxation
Taxes
Unemployment
Commerce
Corporate Income
Corporations
Disasters & Emergencies
Diseases & Health Disorders
For-profit
Insurance
Nonprofit
Presented
Public
Public Health
Public Health Emergency
Ratified
Tax Credits
Taxation
Taxes
Unemployment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
96 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
96 | 14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
96 | 14.14 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
96 | 14.16 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
96 | 15 | (n/a) | Citation Text |