NC S114 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Ch. SL 2015-51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Ch. SL 2015-51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Custodial Parent/Party Cooperate w/Child Supp
Title
Custodial Parent/Party Cooperate w/Child Supp
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Randleman [R] | Sen. Jeffery Tarte [R] | Sen. Stan Bingham [R] | Sen. Benjamin Clark [D] |
Sen. Joyce Krawiec [R] | Sen. Eldon Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Ch. SL 2015-51 | |
2015-06-04 | Signed by Gov. 6/4/2015 | |
2015-05-29 | Pres. To Gov. 05/29/2015 | |
2015-05-28 | Ratified | |
2015-05-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-05-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-05-27 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III |
2015-05-18 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Children, Youth, and Families, if favorable, Judiciary III |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-19 | House | Regular Message Received From Senate |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary I |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H120 (Same As) 2015-03-02 - Ref to the Com on Children, Youth, and Families, if favorable, Judiciary III