NC S110 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-02 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Phase Out Certain HF Transfers
Title
Phase Out Certain HF Transfers
Sponsors
Sen. William Rabon [R] | Sen. Kathryn Harrington [R] | Sen. Wesley Meredith [R] | Sen. Warren Daniel [R] |
Sen. Michael Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | Senate | Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Transportation |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H67 (Same As) 2015-02-11 - Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Appropriations