NC H998 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Improving NC Rural Health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving NC Rural Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - A3 Jones, Bert Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - Motion 12 Appeal Ruling of Chair Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 70 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-06-11 - House - A5 Jackson Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - A1 Adcock Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - A2 Boswell Second Reading (Y: 18 N: 89 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25 Ch. SL 2018-88
2018-06-25 Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018
2018-06-15 Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
2018-06-15 Ratified
2018-06-14HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-14HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2018-06-14HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-06-14HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2018-06-14HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2018-06-14SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-14SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-14SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-14SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-14SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-13SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-13SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2018-06-13SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-06-12SenateRe-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2018-06-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-06-12SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2018-06-12HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-06-11HouseOrdered Engrossed
2018-06-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-11HouseAmend Adopted A5
2018-06-11HouseAmendment Ruled Out of Order A4
2018-06-11HouseAmend Adopted A3
2018-06-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-07HouseAmend Failed A2
2018-06-07HouseAmend Adopted A1
2018-06-06HousePlaced On Cal For 06/07/2018
2018-06-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-05-24HouseRef To Com On Health
2018-05-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-05-23HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S742 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H998&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H998v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H998v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H998v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H998v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H998v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H998v5.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H998v6.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1032
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1031
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1030
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1045
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1044
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1043
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1042
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1179
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=679

Bill Comments

feedback