NC H993 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School Calendar Flexibility/Stanly County
Title
School Calendar Flexibility/Stanly County
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Sasser [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Jeffrey McNeely [R] |
Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2022-06-17 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2022-06-16 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2022-06-16 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2022-06-16 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-05-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Calendar
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Secondary Education
Stanly County
Calendar
Counties
Education
Education Boards
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Secondary Education
Stanly County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | 84.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |