NC H984 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Ch. SL 2016-89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - Ch. SL 2016-89
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transfer of Davie County Correctional Center
Title
Transfer of Davie County Correctional Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Ch. SL 2016-89 | |
2016-07-11 | Signed by Gov. 7/11/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2016 | |
2016-06-30 | Ratified | |
2016-06-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-06-29 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2016-06-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2016 |
2016-06-28 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/29/2016 |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-27 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2016-06-27 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2016-06-27 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-23 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-05-31 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/01/2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-05-27 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-12 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2016-05-12 | House | Reptd Fav |
2016-04-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government, if favorable, Appropriations |
2016-04-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-27 | House | Filed |