NC H982 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
IDD Data Sharing/Longitudinal Data System
Title
IDD Data Sharing/Longitudinal Data System
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-06 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/06/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2018-05-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Education - Universities |
2018-05-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-05-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Education - Universities |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-22 | House | Filed |