NC H978 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Ch. SL 2021-186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Ch. SL 2021-186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to 2021 Appointments Bill
Title
Modifications to 2021 Appointments Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-29 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-29 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 73 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-11-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-29 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 73 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-30 | Ch. SL 2021-186 | |
2021-11-30 | Ratified | |
2021-11-29 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-29 | House | Concurred In S Amend SA1 |
2021-11-29 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-11-29 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-11-29 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2021-11-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-11-18 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-11-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-17 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-11-17 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-11-17 | House | Rules Suspended |
2021-11-17 | House | Filed |
2021-11-17 | House | Reptd Fav. For Introduction |
Subjects
Addictions Specialist Board
Appointments
Boards
Cemeteries
Cemetery Comn.
Chaptered
Chief Information Officer
Clean Water Trust Fund
Clean Water Trust Fund Board
Commissions
Construction
Councils
Counties
Criminal Justice Information Bd.
Disabled Persons
Emerging Technologies
Environment
Environmental Management Comn.
Ethics
Ethics Comn.
Financial Services
Funds & Accounts
General Assembly
Health Services
Housing
Housing Finance Agency
Information Technology
Innovation Council
Institute Of Medicine
Insurance
Irrigation Contractors Board
Judges
Judicial Standards Comn.
Landscape Contractors Board
Landscaping
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Licensing & Certification
Magistrates
Mental Health
Mhddsas Comn.
Municipalities
New Hanover County
Occupations
President Pro Tempore
Private Protective Services Bd.
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Retirement
Roads & Highways
Salaries & Benefits
Security Services
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
Soil Scientists
Soil Scientists Licensing Bd.
Soils
Speaker
State Employees
Substance Abuse
Teachers
Toll Roads & Bridges
Transportation
Transportation Board
Tsers
Tsers Board
Turnpike Authority Board
Unc
Unc Boards Of Trustees
Water & Sewer Systems
Water Resources
Well Contractors Comn.
Wells
Wilmington
Appointments
Boards
Cemeteries
Cemetery Comn.
Chaptered
Chief Information Officer
Clean Water Trust Fund
Clean Water Trust Fund Board
Commissions
Construction
Councils
Counties
Criminal Justice Information Bd.
Disabled Persons
Emerging Technologies
Environment
Environmental Management Comn.
Ethics
Ethics Comn.
Financial Services
Funds & Accounts
General Assembly
Health Services
Housing
Housing Finance Agency
Information Technology
Innovation Council
Institute Of Medicine
Insurance
Irrigation Contractors Board
Judges
Judicial Standards Comn.
Landscape Contractors Board
Landscaping
Law Enforcement
Law Enforcement Officers
Licensing & Certification
Magistrates
Mental Health
Mhddsas Comn.
Municipalities
New Hanover County
Occupations
President Pro Tempore
Private Protective Services Bd.
Public
Public Officials
Ratified
Retirement
Roads & Highways
Salaries & Benefits
Security Services
Sheriff's Training Comn.
Sheriffs
Soil Scientists
Soil Scientists Licensing Bd.
Soils
Speaker
State Employees
Substance Abuse
Teachers
Toll Roads & Bridges
Transportation
Transportation Board
Tsers
Tsers Board
Turnpike Authority Board
Unc
Unc Boards Of Trustees
Water & Sewer Systems
Water Resources
Well Contractors Comn.
Wells
Wilmington