NC H976 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ch. SL 2021-175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-04 - Ch. SL 2021-175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
House Redistricting Plan 2021/HSA-9
Title
House Redistricting Plan 2021/HSA-9
Sponsors
Rep. Destin Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - A1 Graham Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-11-02 - House - A2 Reives Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-11-02 - House - A3 Hall, D. Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-04 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - A1 Graham Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 66 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-11-02 - House - A2 Reives Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-11-02 - House - A3 Hall, D. Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-11-02 - House - Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-04 | Ch. SL 2021-175 | |
2021-11-04 | Ratified | |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Redistricting and Elections |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-11-02 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-11-02 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2021-11-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-11-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-11-02 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2021-11-02 | House | Amend Failed A2 |
2021-11-02 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2021-11-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 11/02/2021 |
2021-11-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-11-01 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-11-01 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2021-10-28 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added |
2021-10-28 | House | Ref To Com On Redistricting |
2021-10-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-10-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
120 | 2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |