NC H971 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-20)
Status: Passed on July 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-22 - Ch. Res 2021-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Honor Melanie Wade Goodwin, Former Member

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honor Melanie Wade Goodwin, Former Member

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-22HouseCh. Res 2021-8
2021-07-22 Ratified
2021-07-21SenateOrdered Enrolled
2021-07-21SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2021-07-21SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2021-07-21SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2021-07-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2021-07-21SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2021-07-21HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2021-07-21HousePassed 3rd Reading
2021-07-21HousePassed 2nd Reading
2021-07-20HousePlaced On Cal For 07/21/2021
2021-07-20HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-06-29HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-29HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-06-24HouseFiled

Subjects


North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback