NC H969 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Enhance Prison Security

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhance Prison Security

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-15 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-15 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A1 Davis Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - A2 McNeill Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25 Ch. SL 2018-67
2018-06-25 Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018
2018-06-15 Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
2018-06-15 Ratified
2018-06-15HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-15HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2018-06-15HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-06-15HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2018-06-15SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-15SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-15SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-15SenateAmend Adopted A1
2018-06-15SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-15SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-06-14SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2018-06-14HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-06-13HouseOrdered Engrossed
2018-06-13HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-13HouseAmend Adopted A2
2018-06-13HouseAmend Adopted A1
2018-06-11HousePlaced On Cal For 06/13/2018
2018-06-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-11HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-05-21HouseRef To Com On Judiciary I
2018-05-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-05-17HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S728 (Same As) 2018-05-23 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H969&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H969v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H969v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H969v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H969v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H969v4.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H969v5.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1113
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1112
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1111
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1226
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=715
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=714

Bill Comments

feedback