NC H965 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
SBIR/STTR Incentive Modifications
Title
SBIR/STTR Incentive Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-06-10 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-06-09 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-06-09 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-06-09 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-12 | House | Ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S494 (Same As) 2021-04-14 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Subjects
Appropriations
Boards
Budgeting
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Corporations
Economic Development
Employment
For-profit
Funds & Accounts
Infrastructure
One North Carolina Fund
Public
Science & Technology Board
Small Business
Small Business Fund
Stem
Boards
Budgeting
Commerce
Commerce Dept.
Corporations
Economic Development
Employment
For-profit
Funds & Accounts
Infrastructure
One North Carolina Fund
Public
Science & Technology Board
Small Business
Small Business Fund
Stem
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143B | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143B | 437.71 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 437.80 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 437.81 | (n/a) | Citation Text |