NC H965 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
National and State Mottos in Schools Act
Title
National and State Mottos in Schools Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - House - A1 Jones, Bert Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 94 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2018-06-07 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2018-06-07 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2018-06-07 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-07 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/07/2018 |
2018-06-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-06-06 | House | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2018-06-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-05-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Appropriations |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-17 | House | Filed |