NC H959 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt Cemetery Property
Title
Exempt Cemetery Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-10-28 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-10-24 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/28/2019 |
2019-10-24 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-10-23 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/24/2019 |
2019-10-23 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-10-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-10-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-10-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-26 | House | Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H959 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H959v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H959v1.pdf |