NC H949 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Occupational Licensing Board Contact Info
Title
Occupational Licensing Board Contact Info
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Jordan [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] |
Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-06-09 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-08 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-08 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-07 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/08/2016 |
2016-06-07 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-07 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II |
2016-06-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-04-26 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2016-04-26 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-04-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S744 (Same As) 2016-04-26 - Ref To Com On Finance