NC H947 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-13)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
The G.R.E.A.T. Broadband Expansion Act
Title
The G.R.E.A.T. Broadband Expansion Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2021-05-26 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2021-05-26 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-26 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-20 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-17 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-17 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-12 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgeting
Counties
Economic Development
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Grants
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Infrastructure
Internet
Ldc
Public
Rural Development
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Budgeting
Counties
Economic Development
Funding
Funds & Accounts
Grants
Information Technology
Information Technology Dept.
Infrastructure
Internet
Ldc
Public
Rural Development
Telecommunications
Teleservices
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
143B | 1373 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 1373.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143B | 437.08 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
146 | 29.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text |