NC H945 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Esports Incentive Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Esports Incentive Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2021-06-09HouseReptd Fav
2021-06-07HouseRe-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-06-07HouseWithdrawn From Com
2021-06-07HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
2021-05-12HouseRef to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2021-05-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2021-05-11HouseFiled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105130.47(n/a)Citation Text
105151.29(n/a)Citation Text

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback