NC H945 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Ch. SL 2018-70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Rape Evidence Collection Kit Tracking Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rape Evidence Collection Kit Tracking Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - M4 Previous Question Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Third Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25 Ch. SL 2018-70
2018-06-25 Signed by Gov. 6/25/2018
2018-06-15 Pres. To Gov. 6/15/2018
2018-06-15 Ratified
2018-06-14HouseOrdered Enrolled
2018-06-14HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2018-06-14HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-06-14HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2018-06-14HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2018-06-14SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2018-06-14SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-14SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-14SenateAmend Adopted A1
2018-06-14SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-06-14SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-14SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-14SenateReptd Fav
2018-06-13SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2018-06-12SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-12SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-06-12SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2018-06-12HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-06-12HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-11HousePlaced On Cal For 06/12/2018
2018-06-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-11HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2018-06-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-06HousePlaced On Cal For 06/07/2018
2018-06-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2018-05-17HouseRef To Com On Judiciary II
2018-05-17HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-05-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S727 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017&BillID=H945&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H945v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H945v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H945v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H945v3.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017/Bills/House/HTML/H945v4.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1026
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1060
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1059
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=677
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=S&RCS=678
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017&sChamber=H&RCS=1178

Bill Comments

feedback