NC H945 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-10 - Ch. SL 2009-574
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-10 - Ch. SL 2009-574
Summary
The Studies Act of 2009.
Title
The Studies Act of 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-10 | Ch. SL 2009-574 | |
2009-09-10 | Signed By Gov. 9/10/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Pres. To Gov. 8/11/2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Ratified | |
2009-08-10 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/10/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-08-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-08-07 | Placed On Cal For 8/7/2009 | |
2009-08-07 | Com Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-08-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-08-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-07 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-05-07 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-05 | Placed On Cal For 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-15 | Re-ref Com On Health | |
2009-04-15 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-01 | Ref to the Com on Federal Relations and Indian Affairs, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-04-01 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H945 |