NC H933 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - Failed Concur In S Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - Failed Concur In S Com Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reciprocity/School Psychologist Licensure
Title
Reciprocity/School Psychologist Licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 38 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - A1 Horn Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 38 N: 53 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 2 Motion 1 To Table (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - A1 Horn Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2018-06-14 | House | Added to Calendar |
2018-06-14 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2018-06-14 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Engrossed |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Amend Adopted A4 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Amend Failed A3 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Amend Tabled A2 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2018-05-18 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2018-05-17 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2018-05-17 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2018-05-16 | House | Reptd Fav |
2018-05-16 | House | Ref To Com On Health |
2018-05-16 | House | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-16 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2018-05-16 | House | Filed |