NC H929 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Recreation Service District - Johnston County

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recreation Service District - Johnston County

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - House - Third Reading (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-06-13SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-06-13SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2018-06-13HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-06-13HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-06-12HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-06-11HousePlaced On Cal For 06/12/2018
2018-06-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-11HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2018-06-07HousePlaced On Cal For 06/11/2018
2018-06-07HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-06-07HouseReptd Fav
2018-06-06HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2018-06-06HouseReptd Fav
2018-05-17HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government I, if favorable, Finance
2018-05-17HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-05-16HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback